Jones v. Summit Ridge Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Deon D. Jones
Defendant: Summit Ridge Hospital and UHS of Summit Ridge, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04268
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration of the #5 Order and #6 Clerk's Judgment by Deon D. Jones. (jpa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action as frivolous. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 11/2/2020. (ddm)
November 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
November 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order. (ddm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Defamation and Libel filed by Deon D. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), a court is required to dismiss an in forma pauperis complaint at any time if the court determines that the allegation of poverty is untrue or that the action: (1) is frivolous or malicious; (2) fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted; or (3) seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. A claim is frivolous if "it lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989). Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Judge for a frivolity determination under 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/21/2020. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #3 Order. (bdb)
October 21, 2020 Submission of #4 Complaint for a frivolity determination under 1915(e)(2).to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr. (bdb)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #2 Order. (eop)
October 19, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deon D. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Summit Ridge Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Ridge Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Summit Ridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?