Gilliard v. CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Lekisha Gilliard
Defendant: CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04305
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Daubert Motions due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (bdb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lekisha Gilliard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Victor)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CMA CGM S.A. for CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.. (Prosch, William)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Lekisha Gilliard.(Roberts, Victor)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission of Mark J. Levine Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 11/23/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
November 23, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark J. Levine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10394642). Attorney Mark J. Levine added appearing on behalf of CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc. (cdg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lekisha Gilliard. (Roberts, Victor)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/19/2021.(Hasbrouck, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark J. Levine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10394642).by CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hasbrouck, Peter) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Lekisha Gilliard. CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc. served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Roberts, Victor)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (tcc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.. (tcc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lekisha Gilliard. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10283945) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliard v. CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lekisha Gilliard
Represented By: Victor Severin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Levine
Represented By: Peter V. Hasbrouck
Represented By: William Frank Prosch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?