Trinity Property Consultants v. Rhodes
Plaintiff: Trinity Property Consultants
Defendant: Breanna Rhodes
Case Number: 1:2020cv04312
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Case electronically remanded to Fulton County Magistrate Court per #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. Status: Submitted. Accepted on 12/7/2020.(jed) Modified on 12/7/2020 (jed).
December 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Breanna Rhodes and Attorney Alain Didier re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation and DIRECTING that this case be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/7/2020. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Docket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash)
November 16, 2020 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Breanna Rhodes and Attorney Alain Didier re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/23/2020 within the #4 R&R. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/23/2020. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal recommending that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/23/2020. (jed)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Breanna Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 22, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop)
October 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Breanna Rhodes and Attorney Alain Didier re #2 Order. (eop) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (eop).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Breanna Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Property Consultants v. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Property Consultants
Represented By: Alain Didier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanna Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?