Property Owner 10, LLC v. Burns
Plaintiff: Property Owner 10, LLC
Defendant: Brittany Burns
Case Number: 1:2020cv04333
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brittany Burns, Property Owner 10, LLC re #7 Letter, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Certified copy of #6 Order mailed to the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Cobb County.(tcc)
November 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This court, finding no error, ADOPTS the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the order and opinion of this court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remand this action the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 11/18/2020. (tcc)
November 17, 2020 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Brittany Burns, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brittany Burns, Property Owner 10, LLC re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/27/2020. (tcc)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #4 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, for the purposes of remand only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/27/2020. (tcc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. This is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further pending in this case, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/27/2020. (tcc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Brittany Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 23, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
October 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brittany Burns re #2 Order. (eop)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Brittany Burns. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Property Owner 10, LLC v. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property Owner 10, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?