Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Rekeep Inv. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: Rekeep Inv. Inc. and Walter Hughley
Case Number: 1:2020cv04343
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Submission of #15 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the registry of the Court, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clayton, Douglas)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's RFAs, ROGs, and RPDs to Defendant ReKeep Investments, Inc. by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
December 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE Of Filing Initial Disclosures by Rekeep Inv. Inc. (Kendall, Alvin)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 , #1 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #11 , #1 COMPLAINT by Walter Hughley.(Moran, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the registry of the Court with Brief In Support by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Clayton, Douglas)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER re #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/1/2020. (jed)
December 1, 2020 Clerks Notation re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Clayton, Douglas)
November 29, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Rekeep Inv. Inc.. (Kendall, Alvin)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Rescission against Walter Hughley, Rekeep Inv. Inc. filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 Rekeep Investment Inc ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Rekeep Inv. Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/12/2021.(Kendall, Alvin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Walter Hughley waiver mailed on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Clayton, Douglas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Jorgensen, Justin)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Clayton, Douglas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Rekeep Inv. Inc. served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Clayton, Douglas)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 26, 2020. (ash)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Walter Hughley, Rekeep Inv. Inc. (Attachments: #1 ReKeep)(bdb)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (bdb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND RESCISSION filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10297680) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rekeep Application, #2 Exhibit B - South Fulton Police Department Report, #3 Exhibit C - September 2, 2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Rekeep Inv. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekeep Inv. Inc.
Represented By: Alvin Lamont Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Hughley
Represented By: Michael John Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Represented By: Douglas Lee Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?