Red Noses, Inc. v. Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Red Noses, Inc. doing business as I1 Localino
Defendant: Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04365
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Red Noses, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Tucker, Kristin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2020. Discovery ends on 3/29/2021. Motions due by 4/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/25/2020. (bdb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Columbia Mutual Insurance Company's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Maple, Christy)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Red Noses, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/20/20. (TWT)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Red Noses, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
November 13, 2020 Please be advised that Charlotte Diggs, Courtroom Deputy to Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., has had to take leave and may be absent from the courthouse for several weeks. Effective immediately all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Thrash should be directed to Mr. Sam Johnston, who will be serving as interim Courtroom Deputy for Judge Thrash pending the return of Ms. Diggs. Mr. Johnstons telephone number is 706-378-4084, and his email is Sam_Johnston@gand.uscourts.gov. (ddm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 5, 2021 through and including July 13, 2021, by Christy M. Maple. (Maple, Christy)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Red Noses, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration)(Bates, Andrea)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Red Noses, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying the Case Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Tucker, Kristin)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 3/29/2021.(Tucker, Kristin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Tucker, Kristin)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Columbia Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10303525) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Summons, #3 Exhibit -C -Notice of Filing, #4 Certificate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 10/27/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Noses, Inc. v. Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy M. Maple
Represented By: Kristin Schneider Tucker
Represented By: Jessica M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Noses, Inc. doing business as I1 Localino
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Bates
Represented By: Kurt Walker Schuettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?