Jackson v. Rawlings et al
Plaintiff: James R. Jackson
Defendant: Tom Rawlings, Jane Meschberger, Christopher M. Carr and David Wood
Case Number: 1:2020cv04368
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT by James R. Jackson. (jpa)
December 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James R. Jackson re #14 Notice (Other). (tmf)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James R. Jackson. (adg)
December 7, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jane Meschberger. (Lones, Laura)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Christopher M. Carr, Tom Rawlings. (Lones, Laura)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Wood. (Lones, Laura)
November 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James R. Jackson re #10 Order on Motion to Stay. (tcc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings [ #6 ]. The Court STAYS discovery proceedings as to all Defendants until the Court rules on all of Defendants' pending and potentially dispositive motions, namely Defendants Rawlings and Carr's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [ #5 ], Defendant Wood's Motion to Dismiss [ #7 ], and Defendant Meschberger's Motion to Dismiss [ #8 ]. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/30/2020. (tcc)
November 20, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Response to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by James R. Jackson. (ddm)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jane Meschberger. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)(Lones, Laura)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by David Wood. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 A Wood Affidavit, #3 B Ryan Affidavit)(Lones, Laura)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Brief In Support by Christopher M. Carr, Tom Rawlings. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)(Lones, Laura)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Christopher M. Carr, Tom Rawlings. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)(Lones, Laura)
October 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James R. Jackson re #4 Order. (tmf)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/28/2020. (tmf)
October 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James R. Jackson re #3 Order. (eop)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Christopher M. Carr and Tom Rawlings. Discovery ends on 3/25/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Christopher M. Carr and Tom Rawlings. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10303374) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Superior Court Records, #2 Exhibit -State Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit -Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Rawlings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rawlings
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Meschberger
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Carr
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Teaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wood
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?