American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Jennings et al
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Vicki Jones Jennings, Ebonye Arnold and Atlanta Bayou, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04399
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Ebonye Arnold waiver mailed on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Carroll, V.)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate ARX Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Vicki Jones Jennings, Other Affiliate Atlanta Bayou, LLC, Other Affiliate Ebonye Arnold for American Strategic Insurance Corp. by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Carroll, V.)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ebonye Arnold. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Bayou, LLC. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Vicki Jones Jennings. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10313695) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Redacted Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Jones Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebonye Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Bayou, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Represented By: V. Morgan Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?