Scott v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Janice Scott
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company and The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04420
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Karabinos, Karen)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Joint Motion to Dismiss, terminating The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and The Travelers Indemnity Company as defendants and substituting The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Charter Oak) as the true party defendant. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/22/2020. (kt)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Home & Marine and Travelers Indemnity and Substitute The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company as the defendant by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karabinos, Karen)
December 14, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss and #6 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (aaq)
December 11, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #16 MOTION to Strike #11 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #12 Response in Opposition to Motion,, with Brief In Support by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law)(Karabinos, Karen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #11 Response in Opposition to Motion,, with Brief In Support by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law)(Karabinos, Karen)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Stay Deadlines and shows the following deadlines will be observed by this Court: December 11, 2020 deadline for Defendants to file Reply Briefs supporting their Motions to Dismiss; and December 21, 2020 deadline for Parties to file Joint Planning Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/30/2020. (kt)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karabinos, Karen)
November 13, 2020 Please be advised that Charlotte Diggs, Courtroom Deputy to Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., has had to take leave and may be absent from the courthouse for several weeks. Effective immediately all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Thrash should be directed to Mr. Sam Johnston, who will be serving as interim Courtroom Deputy for Judge Thrash pending the return of Ms. Diggs. Mr. Johnstons telephone number is 706-378-4084, and his email is Sam_Johnston@gand.uscourts.gov. (ddm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant, The Travelers Indemnity Company filed by Janice Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit Exhibit "H", #9 Exhibit Exhibit "I")(Villani, Ralph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company filed by Janice Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit Exhibit "H", #9 Exhibit Exhibit "I")(Villani, Ralph)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Karabinos, Karen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Karabinos, Karen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Karabinos, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Karabinos, Karen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Indemnity Company.(Karabinos, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Eighth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jpk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Originally filed in State Court) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Originally filed in State Court) Discovery ends on 3/29/2021. (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10319314) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co. Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Travelers Indemnity Co. Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co. Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Travelers Indemnity Co. Answer, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Scott
Represented By: Alexander Gray Hait
Represented By: Ralph J. Villani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos
Represented By: Mary Alice Louise Jasperse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos
Represented By: Mary Alice Louise Jasperse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?