Glushchak v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Olga Glushchak
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04432
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Heffner, Todd)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial disclosures by Olga Glushchak.(Daugherty, Shaun)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The request for an 8-month discovery track is DENIED. Discovery ends on 3/22/2021. Motions due by 4/21/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/2/20. (rlb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File. The original attached exhibits 1-1 and 5-1 are to remain SEALED, and theClerk of this Honorable Court is instructed to accept the attachmentsat Docket Entry 9-2 and 9-3 for filing and to attach them to the applicabledocket entries as UNSEALED exhibits. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/2/20. (rlb)
November 25, 2020 Submission of #12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Olga Glushchak. (Daugherty, Shaun)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Notice of Removal, by Transamerica Life Insurance Company re #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F - Joint Stipulation of Facts)(Heffner, Todd) Modified on 11/24/2020 to edit text(rlb).
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Plaintiff (Daugherty, Shaun)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Substitute Exhibits by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Substituted Copy of Docket Entry 1-1, #3 Exhibit Substituted Copy of Docket Entry 5-1)(Heffner, Todd)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendant to amend its Notice of Removal NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 24, 2020 with sufficient evidence to demonstrate Plaintiffs citizenship or the Court will remand this case for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/18/2020. (tmf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Heffner, Todd)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/9/20. (rlb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 --- SEALED--- ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transamerica Policy)(Heffner, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to seal attachment per attorney's request on 11/18/2020 (ah). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2020: #2 5-1 Unsealed Exhibit) (rlb).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/4/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
November 4, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Covert J. Geary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10336175). Attorney Covert J. Geary added appearing on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (cdg)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Covert J. Geary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10336175).by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Heffner, Todd) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation, Corporate Parent AEGON International B.V. for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Heffner, Todd)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10322902) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -Summons, #3 Exhibit -Plf's Discovery Request, #4 Exhibit -Case Information, #5 Exhibit -Sheriff's Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glushchak v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Glushchak
Represented By: Steven Loube
Represented By: Shaun M. Daugherty, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Michael Heffner
Represented By: Covert J. Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?