Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Lincoln Hotels, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Defendant: Lincoln Hotels, LLC, Lincoln Hospitality Group LLC, R.E., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. and Days Inn Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04444
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent State Street Corp. for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Harris, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 Registry receipt for $12,428.20. Receipt number: GAN100125813. Check/Money Order number: 1698401 (ah)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court. The Clerk is hereby directed to accept the Funds for deposit in the Courts registry. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/24/2020. (ah)
November 20, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the registry of the Court, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Days Inn Worldwide, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Waiver of Service-Wyndham)(Jackson, Kim)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lincoln Hotels, LLC. Lincoln Hotels, LLC waiver mailed on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Christy, John)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing amendment to Civil Cover Sheet by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Joseph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. R.E. waiver mailed on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Signed Waiver of Summons-CD)(Jackson, Kim)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/4/2020. (ah)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the registry of the Court by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Kim)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 -DOCKETED IN ERROR - Unnamed Party -Electronic Summons Issued as to R.E.. (eop) Modified on 11/2/2020 (eop).
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Days Inn Worldwide, Inc.. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lincoln Hospitality Group LLC. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lincoln Hotels, LLC. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10325227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Application, #2 Exhibit -B -Mt. Hawley Policy, #3 Exhibit -C -9/3/20 -ROR, #4 Exhibit -D -Lincoln Ltr to MTH, #5 Exhibit -E -CD Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit -F -AB Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit -G- Wyndham Ltr, #8 Exhibit -H Wyndham ROR, #9 Exhibit -I -Supp Ltr, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020: #11 Proposed Incorrect Summons -3) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Lincoln Hotels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Hotels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Hospitality Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Days Inn Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Jackson Harris
Represented By: Kim M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?