Akkad Holdings, LLC v. Trapollo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Akkad Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Cumberland Bulloch, LLC, Michael Braham, Trapollo, LLC and AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04476
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Cumberland Bulloch, LLC. (Kent, G.)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff, no later than January 5, 2021, to supplement its complaint to indicate the citizenship of each member of the LLC parties. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal of this case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/22/2020. (jta)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM through and including 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/21/2020. (dob)
December 17, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Advacare Pharma USA, LLC's #13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Complaint by Akkad Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, G.) Modified on 12/18/2020 to add applicable link (dob).
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Akkad Holdings, LLC. Trapollo, LLC waiver mailed on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Kent, G.)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Akkad Holdings, LLC. Michael Braham waiver mailed on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Kent, G.)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Akkad Holdings, LLC re #10 Return of Service Executed Notice of Withdrawal of Filing by Akkad Holdings, LLC (Kent, G.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pre-Trial Deadlines Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC. (Eaton, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC. (Eaton, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant Advacare Pharma USA, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint)(Eaton, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cumberland Bulloch, LLC (different address). (jta)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Unexecuted by Akkad Holdings, LLC as to Cumberland Bulloch, LLC. (Kent, G.)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN PER NO 17Return of Service Executed by Akkad Holdings, LLC. Trapollo, LLC served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Kent, G.) Modified on 12/16/2020 (dob).
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Akkad Holdings, LLC (Kent, G.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akkad Holdings, LLC identifying Other Affiliate David Ward, Other Affiliate Steven Shaya for Akkad Holdings, LLC. (Kent, G.)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-4476-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/4/2020. (dob)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #4 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Akkad Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Motion to File Under Seal)(Kent, G.)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Complaint & Exhibit Filed Under Seal by Akkad Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Unredacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supply Agreement with Defendant Trapollo)(Kent, G.)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Eighth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jpk)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC, Michael Braham, Cumberland Bulloch, LLC, and Trapollo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cumberland Bulloch, LLC, #2 Summons AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC, #3 Summons Michael Braham) (jpk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Akkad Holdings, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10332370) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akkad Holdings, LLC v. Trapollo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Bulloch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Braham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trapollo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvaCare Pharma USA, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akkad Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Bruce Corser
Represented By: G. Marshall Kent, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?