Rowe v. Dubber, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Rowe
Defendant: Dubber, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04507
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Motion To Remand filed by John Rowe. (Voyles, James)
December 17, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dubber, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donohue, Luke)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Submission of #10 MOTION for Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER re #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/7/2020. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Clerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Rowe. (Voyles, James)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Dubber, Inc..(Donohue, Luke)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dubber, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dubber Corporation for Dubber, Inc.. (Donohue, Luke)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dubber, Inc.. (Donohue, Luke)
November 23, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #11 Order (Hare, Gregory)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #11 Order (Donohue, Luke)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 20, 2020. (ash)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Dubber, Inc.. (Donohue, Luke)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-4507-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/18/2020. (jta)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S #7 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donohue, Luke) Modified on 11/19/2020 to link to motion (jed).
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dubber, Inc with Jury Demand filed within the #1 Notice of Removal by John Rowe. (Originally filed in Fulton County Superior Court)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by John Rowe. (Originally filed in Fulton County Superior Court) (jed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Dubber, Inc. (Originally filed in Fulton County Superior Court) (jed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Dubber, Inc. (Originally filed in Fulton County Superior Court) (jed)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (bdb)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dubber, Inc. Discovery ends on 4/5/2021. (Filed in State Court and contained with #1 Notice of Removal) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Dubber, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10339243) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Def's Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Pl Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Eric Beylin, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Def's Cert of Authority, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Dubber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rowe
Represented By: James E. Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubber, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Donohue
Represented By: Gregory J Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?