Taylor v. Doe
Plaintiff: Lou M. Taylor
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv04526
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jed)
February 17, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
February 17, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jed)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lou M. Taylor (Sperry, Marcy)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (aaq) (ADI)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena o Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, as to Facebook, Inc.. (Sperry, Marcy)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Within 14 days of this Order, Taylor may serve Facebook with a Rule 45 subpoena requesting information regarding Defendant's identity and contact information. Taylor shall attach a copy of the Complaint and this Order to any subpoena so issued. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/12/2021. (jed)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 4, 2020 Submission of #7 First MOTION to Expedite Discovery to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Expedite Discovery with Brief In Support by Lou M. Taylor. (Sperry, Marcy)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance LOU M. TAYLOR (Sperry, Marcy)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 9, 2020. (ash)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Re-filing of redacted Exhibit D by Lou M. Taylor re #1 Complaint,, Redacted Exhibit D (Sperry, Marcy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (bdb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lou M. Taylor. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10344081) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou M. Taylor
Represented By: Marcy Lane Sperry
Represented By: Melissa Fatima Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?