Doe 2 v. Pace Academy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Defendant: Amelia Tuttle, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, Pace Academy, Inc., Greg C. Kelly, John Does 1-20, Allison Riley, Grady Stevens and Kevin Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv04529
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Case has been electronically remanded to State Court of Fulton County. (rjs)
December 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that this case is remanded to the State Court of Fulton County, Georgia. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' #4 Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration, Motion to Stay, and Motion to Dismiss, as well as Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Defer Ruling, are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/18/2020. (rjs)
December 17, 2020 Submission of the #9 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #4 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Ripeness or Alternatively MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Said Motions Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand, and #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (aaq)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/1/20. (jpa)
December 1, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration, MOTION to Stay, and MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpk)
December 1, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-04529-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpk)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court hereby transfers the above-captioned case to the Honorable Mark H. Cohen. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign this case (Civil Action No. 1:20-CV-04529) to Judge Cohen and further DIRECTS the Clerk to assign to the undersigned the next new case that is set to be assigned to Judge Cohen, in accordance with the standard practices of this Court. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/1/2020. (jpk)
November 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #4 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration MOTION to StayMOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Ripeness or Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Said Motions Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand by Jane Doe 2. (Hodges, Lawanda)
November 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe 2. (Hodges, Lawanda)
November 24, 2020 Submission of the #4 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration, MOTION to Stay, and MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (aaq)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Cases by Pace Academy, Inc., Frederick G. Assaf, Michael Gannon, Allison Riley, Sara Eden, Amelia Tuttle, and Kevin Johnson (Scott, Gailya) Modified on 11/17/2020 to edit filer and modify text (jpk).
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (bdb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, Kevin Johnson, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Amelia Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A Enrollment Contract, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Fred Assaf)(bdb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for TWELVE Trial by Jury by Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, Kevin Johnson, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Amelia Tuttle. (bdb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 SPECIAL APPEARANCE DEMAND TO INVOKE ARBITRATION, ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Frederick G. Assaf, Sara Eden, Michael Gannon, Kevin Johnson, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Amelia Tuttle. Discovery ends on 4/5/2021.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT and jury demand filed by Kevin Johnson, Sara Eden, Pace Academy Board of Trustees, Michael Gannon, Pace Academy, Inc., Allison Riley, Amelia Tuttle, Frederick G. Assaf. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10344504) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 2 v. Pace Academy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Tuttle
Represented By: Brynda Rodriguez Insley
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Academy Board of Trustees
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Assaf
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Eden
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gannon
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Academy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg C. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Riley
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Matthew G. Moffett
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Cody Michael McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Lawanda N. Hodges
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?