Wood v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Defendant: Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley and Matthew Mashburn
Intervenor Defendant: DCCC, James Woodall, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC, Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Melvin Ivey and Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Case Number: 1:2020cv04651
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 75 Certified copy of MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14418. (pjm)
December 11, 2020 Submission of #57 MOTION to Dismiss , #63 MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) of Denial of TRO Motion, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Submission of #53 Emergency MOTION Preservation of Evidence and Inspection of Electronic Election/Voting Equipment and for Production of Original Ballots and Other Documents, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
December 7, 2020 Filing 73 USCA Opinion received AFFIRMING re: #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-14418-RR. (kac)
December 7, 2020 Submission of #20 Amended MOTION to Supplement #7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to File Exhibit Q to Motion, Ramsland Affidavit , #22 MOTION to Intervene , #28 MOTION to Supplement #22 MOTION to Intervene with updated Butler declaration, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
November 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Susan Baker Manning for Georgia State Conference of the NAACP re: Appeal Record Certified. (kac)
November 30, 2020 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #66 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-14418-RR. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 72 Forthwith Request by Circuit to district court for entry of Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification re: #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-14418-RR. (kac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 71 USCA Order GRANTING, IN PART, Emergency Motion for Expedited Review re: #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Appellees must respond to Appellants initial brief by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, December 1, 2020. Appellants reply brief, if any, must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, December 3, 2020. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-14418-RR. (kac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 70 Second MOTION to Amend #20 Amended MOTION to Supplement #7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to File Exhibit Q to Motion, Ramsland Affidavit by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q to TRO Motion Ramsland Affidavit)(Smith, Ray)
November 24, 2020 Filing 69 USCA Acknowledgment of #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-14418-RR. (kac)
November 24, 2020 Filing 68 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #66 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
November 24, 2020 Filing 67 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #66 Notice of Appeal filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (kac)
November 24, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #54 Order by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Transcript Order Form due on 12/8/2020.(kac)
November 24, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by L. Lin Wood, Jr re #54 Order of Appeal of Denial of TRO (Smith, Ray)
November 24, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing Proceedings held on November 19, 2020, before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alicia B. Bagley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER. Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Supplement Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [ECF 20] is GRANTED. Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Supplement Motion to Intervene [ECF 28] is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to Intervenors' Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., et al.'s Motion to Dismiss [ECF 8-1] and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF 57] on or before November 25, 2020. Defendants and Intervenors are ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Appeal [ECF 63] on or before November 25, 2020. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order [ECF 4], all discovery, including third-party discovery, is STAYED pending resolution of Intervenors' and Defendants' motions to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 24, 2020. (ash)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ezra Rosenberg. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 24, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 24, 2020 Payment of Appeal Fees re #66 Notice of Appeal by L. Lin Wood, Jr. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number BGANDC-10413497. (Smith, Ray)
November 23, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Appeal under 1292(b) of Denial of TRO Motion with Brief In Support by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Smith, Ray)
November 23, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of Compliance M. Mertens (Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of Compliance M. Elias (Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Compliance G. Kuhlmann (Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Compliance E. Brailey (Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Compliance A. Velez (Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(McGowan, Charlene)
November 23, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 Emergency MOTION Preservation of Evidence and Inspection of Electronic Election/Voting Equipment and for Production of Original Ballots and Other Documents Defendant-Intervenors' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion filed by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - R. Smith Letter to S. Wilkinson 2020.11.20)(Sparks, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by L. Lin Wood, Jr of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Smith, Ray)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER denying the #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/20/2020. (jed)
November 20, 2020 Filing 53 Emergency MOTION Preservation of Evidence and Inspection of Electronic Election/Voting Equipment and for Production of Original Ballots and Other Documents by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Smith, Ray)
November 20, 2020 RETURN of #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Baker Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10394814). to attorney for correction. (cdg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Hearing held on Plaintiff's #6 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court GRANTED Intervenor Defendants Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC, and DCCC's #8 Motion to Intervene as Defendants. The Court DENIED Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(jed)
November 19, 2020 Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Baker Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10394814).by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Russell D. Willard (McGowan, Charlene)
November 19, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McGowan, Charlene)
November 19, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Adam M. Sparks (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Joyce Gist Lewis (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Kevin J. Hamilton (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Greenbaum, Jon)
November 19, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Susan P. Coppedge (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Amanda R. Callais (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Amanda J. Beane (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Julie M. Houk with the Court's Standing Order on Civil Litigation (Sells, Bryan) Modified on 11/23/2020 to edit text(jed).
November 19, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Powers, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE Of Filing by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, Affidavits In Support Of #31 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1: Shameika Vailes, #2 Affidavit 2: Angela Thomas, #3 Affidavit 3: Kimberly Brandon, #4 Affidavit 4: Doris Sumner, #5 Affidavit 5: Robin Lourie, #6 Affidavit 6: Olivia Alston, #7 Affidavit 7: Russell Cason, #8 Affidavit 8: Steve Young, #9 Affidavit 9: Beth Graham, #10 Affidavit 10: Rebecca Short, #11 Affidavit 11: Sara Ghazal, #12 Affidavit 12: Sharon Zydney, #13 Affidavit 13: Komal Patel)(Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Court's Standing Order (Powers, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE Of Filing 2020.11.19 PPC Notice of Intent to Rely on Exhibits and Affidavits by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #21 Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding,,, (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE Of Filing by L. Lin Wood, Jr re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to TRO Motion Thorne Affidavit)(Smith, Ray)
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chris Harvey)(McGowan, Charlene)
November 19, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, Attorney Declaration of Amanda R. Callais by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - SOS Notice 2020.11.09, #2 Ex. 2 - The Hill 2020.11.11, #3 Ex. 3 - SOS Press release 2020.11.13, #4 Ex. 4 - OEB 2020.11.12, #5 Ex. 5 - OEB 2020.05.01, #6 Ex. 6 - SOS Press Release 2020.11.18, #7 Ex. 7 - SEB Notice 2020.03.05, #8 Ex. 8 - Official Election Results 2020.11.18, #9 Ex. 9 - SOS Facebook Post 2020.11.15, #10 Ex. 10 - Reuters 2020.11.11, #11 Ex. 11 - Washington Post 2020.11.16, #12 Ex. 12 - CBS News 2020.11.13, #13 Ex. 13 - AJC 2020.10.19, #14 Ex. 14 - AJC 2020.11.15, #15 Ex. 15 - OEB 2020.11.13, #16 Ex. 16 - Rodden Expert Report 2020.11.18)(Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice.by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED Proposed Intervenor-Defendant Political Party Committees' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE Of Filing Attorney Declaration by L. Lin Wood, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Declarations)(Smith, Ray)
November 19, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Sells, Bryan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Supplement #22 MOTION to Intervene with updated Butler declaration by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Butler declaration)(Sells, Bryan)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Houk. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Ezra David Rosenberg added appearing on behalf of Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall (cdg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexi M. Velez. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391214). Attorney John Michael Powers added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Conference Of the NAACP, et al. (cdg) Modified on 11/19/2020 to correct party appearing on behalf of (cdg).
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexi M. Velez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388444).. Attorney Alexi Machek Velez added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10390836). Attorney Jon M. Greenbaum added appearing on behalf of Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall (cdg)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Mertens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388463).. Attorney Matthew Mertens added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Brailey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388481). Attorney Emily Rachel Brailey added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (cdg)
November 19, 2020 RETURN of #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391419). to attorney for correction re: case number. (cdg)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388354).. Attorney Marc E. Elias added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388395).. Attorney Amanda R. Callais added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388415).. Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda J. Beane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388436).. Attorney Amanda J. Beane added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc Erik Elias. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda R. Callais. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jon Greenbaum. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Mertens. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388493). Attorney Gilliam Kuhlmann added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (cdg)
November 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391209). Attorney Julie Marie Houk added appearing on behalf of Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall (cdg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gillian Kuhlmann. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Powers. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Hamilton. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda J. Beane. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily Brailey. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 19, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
November 18, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391419).by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Court's Standing Order (Smith, Ray)
November 18, 2020 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391214).by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10391209).by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10390836).by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Helen Butler, James Woodall, Melvin Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Woodall declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ivey declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Powers declaration)(Sells, Bryan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 at 03:00 PM in No Courtroom before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1609807754; Meeting ID: 160 980 7754; Passcode: 841353. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (ash)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to Supplement #7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to File Exhibit Q to Motion, Ramsland Affidavit by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q Ramsland Affidavit)(Smith, Ray)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Willard, Russell)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388493).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Brailey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388481).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Mertens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388463).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexi M. Velez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388444).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda J. Beane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388436).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388415).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388395).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10388354).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants with Brief In Support by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC, DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Intervenors' Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Intervenors' Brief in Support of Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C: Proposed Intervenors' Proposed Answer to Amended Complaint)(Sparks, Adam)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to File Exhibit Q to Motion, Ramsland Affidavit by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q Ramsland Affidavit)(Smith, Ray)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Litigation Settlement, #2 Exhibit B Coleman Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C Deitrich Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D Volyes Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E Zeher Affidavit, #6 Exhibit F Romero Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G Reyes Affidavit, #8 Exhibit H Johnston Affidavit, #9 Exhibit I Silva Affidavit, #10 Exhibit J O'Neal Affidavit, #11 Exhibit K Fisher Affidavit, #12 Exhibit L Savage Affidavit, #13 Exhibit M Peterford Affidavit, #14 Exhibit N Redacted Declaration, #15 Exhibit O Makridis Declaration, #16 Exhibit P Failure Study, #17 Exhibit R Moore Affidavit, #18 Exhibit S S. Hall Affidavit, #19 Exhibit T R Hall Affidavit, #20 Exhibit U Hartman Affidavit)(Smith, Ray)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint: Litigation Settlement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint: Coleman Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint: Deidrich Affidavit, #4 Affidavit Amended Complaint Verification)(Smith, Ray) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 16, 2020. (ash)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by L. Lin Wood, Jr. (Smith, Ray)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by L. Lin Wood, Jr.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number BGANDC-10373555) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Litigation Settlement, #2 Verification regarding Election, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Ray Stallings Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DCCC
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Gillian Kuhlmann
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: James Woodall
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Gillian Kuhlmann
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Gillian Kuhlmann
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Helen Butler
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Melvin Ivey
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Susan Baker Manning
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?