ATLeisure, LLC v. Sunvilla Corporation
Plaintiff: ATLeisure, LLC
Defendant: Sunvilla Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04662
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunvilla Corporation identifying Corporate Parent MWH (Hongkong) Co., Limited for Sunvilla Corporation. (Levie, Walter)
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Sunvilla Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Affidavit of Steven C. Malin, Esq., #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Levie, Walter)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Hill Levie, III on behalf of Sunvilla Corporation (Levie, Walter)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Malin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10607359).by Sunvilla Corporation. (Schaetzel, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Schaetzel on behalf of Sunvilla Corporation (Schaetzel, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application of Ryan T. Santurri for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/17/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
December 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Santurri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10475735).. Attorney Ryan T. Santurri added appearing on behalf of ATLeisure, LLC (nmb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ATLeisure, LLC. Sunvilla Corporation waiver mailed on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Breloski, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Santurri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10475735). with Brief In Support by ATLeisure, LLC. (Breloski, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by ATLeisure, LLC. (Breloski, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sunvilla Corporation. (rvb) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct defendant name (rvb).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rvb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by ATLeisure, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number BGANDC-10379435) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATLeisure, LLC v. Sunvilla Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunvilla Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M. Schaetzel
Represented By: Walter Hill Levie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLeisure, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Breloski
Represented By: Ryan T. Santurri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?