Evans et al v. Bearback, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Evans and Duvall & Evans, Inc.
Defendant: Bearback, LLC and James M. Duvall
Case Number: 1:2020cv04857
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Duvall & Evans, Inc., Jeffrey L. Evans. (Fuller, Zachary)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including February 5, 2021, to file a response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/28/21. (hfm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bearback, LLC, James M. Duvall. (Leeper, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendants Bearback, LLC and James M. Duvall Pursuant to FRCP 12(B) with Brief In Support by Bearback, LLC, James M. Duvall. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Leeper, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #13 and #14 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/15/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
January 15, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Martin Bruce Sipple Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10600385).. Attorney Martin B. Sipple added appearing on behalf of Duvall & Evans, Inc., Jeffrey L. Evans (nmb)
January 15, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Michael Hogan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10600433).. Attorney Steven M. Hogan added appearing on behalf of Duvall & Evans, Inc., Jeffrey L. Evans (nmb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven Michael Hogan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10600433).by Duvall & Evans, Inc., Jeffrey L. Evans. (Weathington, Paul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Martin Bruce Sipple Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10600385).by Duvall & Evans, Inc., Jeffrey L. Evans. (Weathington, Paul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bearback, LLC, James M. Duvall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Leeper, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bearback, LLC and James M. Duvall Answers due 1/15/2021. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/7/21. (hfm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Martin B. Sipple. Clerk to follow-up by 1/14/2021. (nmb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven M. Hogan. Clerk to follow-up by 1/14/2021. (nmb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by James M. Duvall, Bearback, LLC. All Defendants. (Leeper, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/7/2020. (rlb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rlb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Fuller, Zachary)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
December 2, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to James M. Duvall. (eop)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bearback, LLC. (eop)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jeffrey L. Evans and Duvall & Evans, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number BGANDC-10433362) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Bearback, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bearback, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Duvall
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Evans
Represented By: Zachary Hodge Fuller
Represented By: Paul E. Weathington
Represented By: Steven M. Hogan
Represented By: Martin B. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duvall & Evans, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Hodge Fuller
Represented By: Paul E. Weathington
Represented By: Steven M. Hogan
Represented By: Martin B. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?