Gleaton v. Snow et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Gleaton, Sr.
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Lionel Snow, Dyrick Fowler and Kimberly Wright
Case Number: 1:2020cv04937
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby Gleaton, Sr. re #8 Notice (Other). (ddm)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Dyrick Fowler, Lionel Snow, United States Postal Service, Kimberly Wright, Kimberly Wright. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Herbst)(Williams, Melaine)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Because no opposition was filed and for good cause shown, Defendants' #5 Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have through and including January 24, 2021, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/4/20. (bnw)
January 4, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby Gleaton, Sr. re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (bnw)
December 31, 2020 Submission of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (tcc)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation for cases proceeding before the Honorable J. P. Boulee. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/14/20. (ddm)
December 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby Gleaton, Sr. re #6 Order. (ddm)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby Gleaton, Sr. re #4 Notice (Other). (ddm)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond with Brief In Support by Dyrick Fowler, Lionel Snow, United States Postal Service, Kimberly Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Melaine)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dyrick Fowler, Bobby Gleaton, Sr., Lionel Snow and Kimberly Wright re #3 Order. (eop)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and COUNTERCLAIM against Bobby Gleaton, Sr. filed by Kimberly Wright. ( Discovery ends on 5/3/2021.) (Filed in Magistrate Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit -C -Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleaton v. Snow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gleaton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Melaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionel Snow
Represented By: Melaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyrick Fowler
Represented By: Melaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Wright
Represented By: Melaine A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?