Stafford v. Kedrion S.p.A. et al
Plaintiff: Furquan R. Stafford
Defendant: OctaPharma AG, Grifols, S.A., CSL Limited, Kedrion S.p.A., CSL Plasma, Inc., Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc., Kedrion BioPharma, Inc. and OctaPharma Plasma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04970
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Furquan R. Stafford re #31 Notice (Other). (rjs)
January 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Kay Seals on behalf of OctaPharma Plasma, Inc. (Seals, Amanda)
January 26, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by OctaPharma Plasma, Inc.. (Rains, John)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Rains, IV on behalf of OctaPharma Plasma, Inc. (Rains, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendant, Octapharma Plasma, Inc. by Furquan R. Stafford. (bdb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kedrion BioPharma, Inc., Kedrion S.p.A. identifying Corporate Parent Sestant Internazionale S.p.A. for Kedrion S.p.A.. (Councill, Stephen)
January 22, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay Certain Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ambler, Robert)
January 22, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Kedrion Biopharma, Inc., Octapharma Plasma, Inc., Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc., and CSL Plasma, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ambler, Robert) Modified on 1/25/2021 to correct filer information (rjs).
January 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ambler, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to correct the docket to reflect that Doc. 15 and Doc. 16 were filed on behalf of Defendant Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc. and not Grifols, S.A. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/13/2021. (rjs)
January 13, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Furquan R. Stafford re #22 Order. (rjs)
January 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Paul Gunnemann on behalf of Kedrion BioPharma, Inc., Kedrion S.p.A. (Gunnemann, Joshua)
January 6, 2021 Submission of #11 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 6 to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Correct Docket Entries #16 Notice of Appearance, #15 Notice of Appearance by Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ambler, Robert)
December 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Furquan R. Stafford re #19 Order. (rjs)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the #18 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including January 22, 2021, for Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc., Kedrion BioPharma, Inc., CSL Plasma, Inc., and Octapharma Plasma, Inc. to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/21/2020. (ddm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ambler, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (Ambler, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Hanner White on behalf of Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc. (White, Brendan) Modified on 1/13/2021 (rjs).
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Riles Ambler, Jr on behalf of Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc. (Ambler, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2021 (rjs).
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Councill on behalf of Kedrion BioPharma, Inc., Kedrion S.p.A. (Councill, Stephen)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Limited, CSL Plasma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSL Behring, LLC for CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Reise, Sarah)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Tope Reise on behalf of CSL Limited, CSL Plasma, Inc. (Reise, Sarah)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 6 by Furquan R. Stafford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(kt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Furquan R. Stafford. CSL Plasma, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (kt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Furquan R. Stafford. Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (kt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Furquan R. Stafford. OctaPharma Plasma, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (kt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Furquan R. Stafford. Kedrion BioPharma, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (kt)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Furquan R. Stafford re #6 Order. (eop)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.. (eop)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CSL Plasma, Inc.. (eop)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OctaPharma Plasma, Inc.. (eop)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kedrion BioPharma, Inc.. (eop)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Furquan R. Stafford. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100126028) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. Kedrion S.p.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OctaPharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grifols, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Limited
Represented By: Sarah Tope Reise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kedrion S.p.A.
Represented By: Stephen D. Councill
Represented By: Joshua Paul Gunnemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Plasma, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Tope Reise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grifols Shared Services North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Riles Ambler, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Hanner White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kedrion BioPharma, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Councill
Represented By: Joshua Paul Gunnemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OctaPharma Plasma, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: Amanda Kay Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furquan R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?