Sartor v. Pearce et al
Plaintiff: Gary Sartor
Defendant: U.S. Marshals Service (USMS), The GEO Group, Officer L. Johnson, Officer Cotton, Warden Pearce and Officer Moore
Case Number: 1:2020cv05182
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Warden re #6 Order. (rlb)
February 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gary Sartor re #6 Order. Forms sent to party: 28:1331 Form. (rlb)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/2/21 within #6 Order. (rlb)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for IFP status #2 is GRANTED, and he is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $13.00 within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If this Court determines at a later point in the proceedings that appointment of counsel is warranted, it will sua sponte reconsider his request. The warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforementioned $13.00 initial partial filing fee and the monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to submit an Amended Complaint within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff may not incorporate by reference any portion of his original Complaint into the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to (1) send Plaintiff a blank copy of thisCourts Bivens complaint and resubmit to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Service of process shall not issue until further screening of Plaintiff's amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/2/21. (rlb)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gary Sartor re #5 Notice (Other). (rlb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
December 22, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination; and #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)
December 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gary Sartor re #4 Order. (eop)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Sartor. (eop)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Gary Sartor. (eop)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gary Sartor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sartor v. Pearce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshals Service (USMS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GEO Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sartor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?