Dukes v. Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Melanie Dukes
Defendant: Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05193
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melanie Dukes. Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc. waiver mailed on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Mixon, J.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc. (jpa)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT to GENERAL ORDER 20-01 in re: Court Operations under the Exigent Circumstances created by Covid-19 and Related Coronavirus. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (jpa)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Melanie Dukes. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10522686) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nippon Express U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Dukes
Represented By: J. Stephen Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?