Johnson v. Cascade Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Johnson
Defendant: Cascade Capital, LLC and VeriCredit Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05222
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Patrick Johnson. Cascade Capital, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Berry, Matthew)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cascade Capital, LLC. (ddm)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Patrick Johnson (Berry, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Johnson. VeriCredit Solutions, LLC waiver mailed on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Berry, Matthew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Patrick Johnson. (Berry, Matthew)
December 28, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patrick Johnson. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10535137) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cascade Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VeriCredit Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?