Aguilar Marquinez et al v. Dole Food Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Guzman Castro Epifano, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Daniel Serrano Chito and Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez
Defendant: Dole Fresh Fruit Company, Standard Fruit Company, Shell Oil Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Dole Food Company, Inc., Standard Fruit and Steamship Company, Chiquita Fresh North America, L.L.C., Chiquita Brands, L.L.C. and AMVAC Chemical Corporation
Petitioner: Cameron McWhirter
Case Number: 1:2020mi00157
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cameron McWhirter. (Bauer, S.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez, Daniel Serrano Chito, Guzman Castro Epifano, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan re Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Resubmission (Nolan, Clare)
November 20, 2020 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott M. Hendler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10386383). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel's address. (nmb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena - AMENDED RESPONSE filed by Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez, Daniel Serrano Chito, Guzman Castro Epifano, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Nolan, Clare)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Cameron McWhirter filed by Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez, Daniel Serrano Chito, Guzman Castro Epifano, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Nolan, Clare) Modified on 11/18/2020 to note attorney filed document incorrectly and will be refiling (ddm).
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott M. Hendler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10386383).by Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez, Daniel Serrano Chito, Guzman Castro Epifano, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Cameron McWhirter, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan. (Nolan, Clare) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Nolan on behalf of Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez, Daniel Serrano Chito, Guzman Castro Epifano, Jacinto Martinez Ibarra, Federico Salinas Jimenez, Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez, Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan (Nolan, Clare)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT: By agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs' response brief will be due on November 17, 2020. Movant's reply (if any) is due on November 24, 2020. A Zoom oral argument will take place on December 2, 2020 at 2 p.m. Eastern Time. Counsel for Movant is ORDERED to provide a copy of this order to all counsel of record in the underlying litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 11/02/20. (CMS)
October 28, 2020 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NON-PARTY MOTION to Quash Subpoena with Brief In Support by Cameron McWhirter. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A -Affidavit of C. McWhirter, #3 Exhibit -B -Chiquita Article, #4 Exhibit -C -Complaint, #5 Exhibit -D -Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit -E -Hearing Transcript, #7 Exhibit -F -Columbia Journalism Review, #8 Exhibit -G, #9 Exhibit -H - McWhirter Objection, #10 Exhibit -I -Oct. 12 Meet & Confer Email, #11 Exhibit -J -Oct. 16 Meet & Confer Email, #12 Exhibit -K -Oct. 19 Meet & Confer Email, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar Marquinez et al v. Dole Food Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Fresh Fruit Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fruit Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Food Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fruit and Steamship Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Fresh North America, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brands, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMVAC Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Pesantez Redrovan
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Martinez Ibarra
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heris Geovanny Malla Lopez
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guzman Castro Epifano
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federico Salinas Jimenez
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Serrano Chito
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Antonio Aguilar Marquinez
Represented By: Clare Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cameron McWhirter
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Erin Marie Morrissey Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?