Gibson v. AT&T Corp.
Plaintiff: Andrew Gibson
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00097
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion to Stay. This action and all deadlines associated with it are hereby STAYED so that the parties can continue their extrajudicial discussions. Further, AT&T will take no action before or during the stay that contravenes the Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) entered on December 30, 2020 by the Honorable Judge George Kreeger, Cobb County Superior Court, which TRO will continue in effect during the stay by agreement of the parties. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case during the period of the stay. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/25/2021. (jta)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Stay by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnum, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
January 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction, TRO Order (State Court Affidavit of Service), as to AT&T Corp.. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Amended Certificate of Service by AT&T Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal (Barnum, Eric) Modified on 1/8/2021 to edit text to accurately reflect e-filed document (jta).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by AT&T Corp.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10578590) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gibson
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Represented By: Leslie Maddox Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Eric Leroy Barnum
Represented By: Mitchell Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?