United States of America v. $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK
Case Number: 1:2021cv00292
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING the Unopposed #17 Motion to Stay Proceedings. These forfeiture proceedings are STAYED pending further order of the Court. Claimant Shannon Parish's Unopposed #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to allow for re-filing after the criminal case is resolved and further action becomes necessary. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/12/21. (jpa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharkey, Kimberly)
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 CLAIM Verified by $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Civil Verification Signed)(Sharkey, Kimberly)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK. (Sharkey, Kimberly)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date March 6, 2021. (Sneed, Sekret)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Fofeiture by United States of America sent to Riverdale Address (Sneed, Sekret)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America sent to Fairburn Address (Sneed, Sekret)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America sent to East Point Address (Sneed, Sekret)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America sent to Shannon Parish via Nick Lotito (Sneed, Sekret)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Sneed, Sekret)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed on 2/4/2021 for $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK Account Number XXXXXX0668. (Sneed, Sekret)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERRORNOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America sent to Jessee Mowbray at Gainsville address (Smith, Cynthia) Modified on 1/29/2021, per call from counsel. (fem).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Warrant for Arrest in Rem as to Defendant $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency. (cmd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 01/20/2021. (bdb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $61,870.52 in U.S. Currency seized from Bank OZK
Represented By: Kimberly Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sekret T. Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?