The General Electric Company v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: The General Electric Company
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00333
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 New Civil Action Number in USDC DC 1:21-cv-345 (aar)
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. CSX Transportation waiver mailed on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) Modified on 2/11/2021 QC email set re transferred case(tmf).
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-14 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to USDC District of Columbia for inclusion in MDL 2925. (tmf)
February 8, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
February 8, 2021 Case electronically transferred to USDC District of Columbia. (tmf)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James Michael Grippando. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James P. Denvir. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Scott E. Gant. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stuart H. Singer. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. BNSF Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver mailed on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/24/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Lowrey, Frank)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/22/2021. (tmf)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (eop)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (eop)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation. (eop)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (eop)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The General Electric Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10627975) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The General Electric Company v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The General Electric Company
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey, IV
Represented By: Scott E. Gant
Represented By: Tiana Scogin Mykkeltvedt
Represented By: James Michael Grippando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?