Your Home Solutions LLC v. Comer
Plaintiff: Your Home Solutions LLC
Defendant: Kimberly Comer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00370
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Walter E Johnson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
February 16, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Comer, Your Home Solutions LLC re #7 Order, #8 Letter. (ddm)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to DeKalb County Magistrate Court regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2021: #1 Acceptance of Filing from Dekalb County) (ddm).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving and adopting the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court and remanding this case to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/16/2021. (ddm)
February 12, 2021 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (aaq)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Comer, Your Home Solutions LLC re #6 Notice (Other). (ddm)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 25, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Comer re #5 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation and #4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/25/21. (klb)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Kimberly Comer. The undersigned GRANTS the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 for the limited purpose of remand, and RECOMMENDS this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/25/21. (klb)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Kimberly Comer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of remand. (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation) Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/25/21. (klb)
January 22, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Comer and Your Home Solutions LLC re #2 Order. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kimberly Comer. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Your Home Solutions LLC v. Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Your Home Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?