Young v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Doyle Young
Defendant: United States, Dept. of Justice and U. S. Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2021cv00690
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing proposed amended complaint by Timothy Doyle Young re #1 Complaint. (adg)
March 23, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy Doyle Young re #6 Order and #7 Clerk's Judgment. (bdb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that the action be DISMISSED without prejudice as frivolous. (bdb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
March 22, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/22/2021. (bdb)
March 22, 2021 Docket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash)
March 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy Doyle Young re #5 Notice (Other). (adg)
March 11, 2021 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (rvb)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
February 19, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy Doyle Young re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 2/18/2021. (jed)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint recommending that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 2/18/2021. (jed)
February 18, 2021 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
February 18, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy Doyle Young re #2 Order. (eop)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Doyle Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Doyle Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?