Wood v. Cascade Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wood
Defendant: Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd, Cascade Capital LLC and AvanteUSA, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00731
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Of All Claims With Prejudice Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Cheryl Wood (Nelson, John)
March 1, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman terminated from case. (cmd)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of this case upon finalization of the settlement. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/1/2021. (cmd)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Cheryl Wood (Carlson, Clifford)
February 24, 2021 Clerks Notation re: #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 02/24/2021. (cmb)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd identifying Corporate Parent: Nationwide Recovery Holdings, LLC for Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. (eop)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10742171) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Signed Consent to Removal - AvanteUSA, LP, #5 Signed Consent to Removal -Cascade Capital, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Cascade Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd
Represented By: Carl Hugo Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AvanteUSA, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wood
Represented By: John William Nelson
Represented By: Clifford Carlson
Represented By: Ronald Edward Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?