Muhammad-Ali v. U. S. Congress et al
Petitioner: Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali and Marcus O. Taite
Respondent: 50th Inferior States and U. S. Congress
Case Number: 1:2021cv00742
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Submission of #9 MOTION 28USC1654 Pursuant to 28USC453 of 28USC1691by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION 28USC1654 Pursuant to 28USC453 of 28USC1691by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali. (tmf)
March 12, 2021 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
March 11, 2021 Forwarded #8 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali to USCA. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali. (ddm) Modified on 3/11/2021 to note motion has been termed and document has been forwarded to USCA (ddm).
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) Certificate of Interested Persons by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali. (ddm) Modified on 3/11/2021 to note document has been forwarded to USCA (ddm).
March 10, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali re #6 Order (rvb)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali. (ddm)
February 25, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 Final Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/25/2021. (ddm)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/25/2021. (ddm)
February 23, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
February 23, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali re #2 Order. (eop)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad-Ali v. U. S. Congress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Drelijah J. Muhammad-Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus O. Taite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 50th Inferior States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?