Perkins LLC. v. Fille, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Perkins LLC.
Defendant: Lenny Petrou, Fille, Inc. and Numero-III, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01066
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue Reply Declaration of Lenny Petrou in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue filed by Lenny Petrou. (Williams, Raymond) Modified on 4/20/2021 (ah).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Or, In The Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Lenny Petrou. (Williams, Raymond) Modified on 4/20/2021 (ah).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Perkins LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Szaflarski Declaration, #2 Exhibit B- Davis Declaration)(Caiola, Anne)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and #3 MOTION for Emergency Hearing. (jeh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Brief In Support by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue)(Abrams, Caela)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Alfred DIsernia, III. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph D'Ambrosio. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice.by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Williams, Raymond) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph D'Ambrosio added appearing on behalf of Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou (cdg)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Duplicate application of document #8 . (cdg)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Joseph D'Ambrosio re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Alfred DIsernia, III re #12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred DIsernia, III Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alfred D'Isernia, III added appearing on behalf of Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou (cdg)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***APPROVED IN ERROR*** #7 is a duplicate of #8 ..APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph D'Ambrosio added appearing on behalf of Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou (cdg) Modified on 3/19/2021 to correct text(cdg).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou (Williams, Raymond)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred DIsernia, III Pro Hac Vice.by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Williams, Raymond) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Williams, Raymond) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10830642). to attorney for correction. Not filed by local counsel. (nmb)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred D'Isernia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10830480). to attorney for correction. Incorrect attorney information and not filed by local counsel. (nmb)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and #3 MOTION for Emergency Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606517097 Meeting ID: 160 651 7097 Passcode: 622453 or dial 669 254 5252; Meeting ID: 160 651 7097 Passcode: 622453. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jeh)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph D'Ambrosio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10830642).by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Abrams, Caela) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred D'Isernia Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10830480).by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou. (Abrams, Caela) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. (ah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Emergency Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Perkins LLC. (ah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED by Perkins LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Fille, Inc., Numero-III, Inc., Lenny Petrou (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10828709). (Attachments: #1 State pleadings)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #3 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins LLC. v. Fille, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perkins LLC.
Represented By: Anne Peirce Caiola
Represented By: James White Faris, VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny Petrou
Represented By: Caela Abrams
Represented By: Raymond Kyle Williams
Represented By: Joseph D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Alfred D'Isernia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fille, Inc.
Represented By: Caela Abrams
Represented By: Raymond Kyle Williams
Represented By: Joseph D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Alfred D'Isernia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numero-III, Inc.
Represented By: Caela Abrams
Represented By: Raymond Kyle Williams
Represented By: Joseph D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Alfred D'Isernia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?