Vazquez-Mundo v. The Geo Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Vazquez-Mundo
Defendant: The Geo Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01138
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery is stayed until this Court rules on the Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to applicability of the statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/17/2021. (ah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order re: #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. (Roney, Alexia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Geo Group Inc.. (Roney, Alexia)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by The Geo Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roney, Alexia)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by The Geo Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment of the Pleadins, #2 Exhibit Green v. Quicken Loans, LLC, #3 Exhibit Owens v. Perdue Farms, Inc.)(Roney, Alexia)
May 7, 2021 Clerks Notation re #11 Leave of Absence by Matthew F. Boyer. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Matthew F. Boyer on these dates. (jeh)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/27/21 to 6/4/21 and 7/5/21 to 7/16/21, by Matthew F. Boyer. (Boyer, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons and #10 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Juan Jose Vazquez-Mundo. (Rockefeller, A.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Geo Group Inc.. (Boyer, Matthew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 GEO's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by The Geo Group Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/13/2021.(Roney, Alexia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexia Ruffner Roney on behalf of The Geo Group Inc. (Roney, Alexia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Boyer on behalf of The Geo Group Inc. (Boyer, Matthew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits, Order , as to The Geo Group Inc., received by Xiamara Montezuma. (Rockefeller, A.)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DECLINING and REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-1138-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 03/26/2021. (bdb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Geo Group Inc.. (eop)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Juan Jose Vazquez-Mundo. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10840827) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -12th Order Extending Declarations, #2 Exhibit -Medical Notes from Ice Detention Center, #3 Exhibit -Camden Medical Reports, #4 Exhibit - Wellstar Medical Record, #5 Affidavit -Medical Expert Affidavit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 3/23/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez-Mundo v. The Geo Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Geo Group Inc.
Represented By: Alexia Ruffner Roney
Represented By: Matthew F. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Vazquez-Mundo
Represented By: A. James Rockefeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?