Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Common Cause and Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Defendant: Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley and Matthew Mashburn
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Republican National Committee
Case Number: 1:2021cv01259
Filed: March 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 10301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 34 Consent MOTION regarding the defendants' answer or response to the plaintiffs' complaint by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/24/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
May 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney H. Christopher Bartolomucci added appearing on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (nmb)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/21/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
May 20, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice. appearing on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (cdg)
May 18, 2021 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice.by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2021 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice.by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 17, 2021 RETURN of #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971325). to attorney for correction re: Parties being represented. (cdg)
May 17, 2021 RETURN of #30 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971331). to attorney for correction re: Parties being represented. (cdg)
May 14, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - SB 202 As Passed)(Tyson, Bryan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971331).by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 12, 2021 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971325).by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 12, 2021 Submission of #19 MOTION to Intervene , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
May 3, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
April 26, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - the Greenbaum Email)(Sells, Bryan)
April 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Cameron T. Norris added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 #25 #26 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/22/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 20, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2021 RETURN of #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903362). to attorney for correction regarding incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 20, 2021 RETURN of #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903504). to attorney for correction regarding incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 5/14/21. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/16/21. (bnw)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order FILED IN ERROR ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the #19 pleading filed by Amicus Curiae at is STRICKEN from the record. Non-parties must seek leave of the Court to file any documents in this case and may not proceed with such proposed filing unless leave is granted. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/16/21. (bnw) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit text (bnw).
April 16, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction re 4/16/21 Order: Filed in error. Wrong case. Please disregard. (bnw)
April 15, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903504).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 15, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903362).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/24/21, 5/25/21, 5/26/21, 5/27/21, 5/28/21, 7/22/21, 7/23/21, 9/27/21, 9/28/21, 9/29/21, 9/30/21, 10/1/21, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer)(Carver, William)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10880317).. Attorney Julie Marie Houk added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (nmb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 #11 #12 #13 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/8/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Paradise, Loree Anne)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Jacoutot, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Tyson, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10873841).. Attorney Ezra David Rosenberg added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (nmb)
April 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Vilia B. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876056).. Attorney Vilia Hayes added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (nmb)
April 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil Oxford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876061).. Attorney Neil Oxford added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (nmb)
April 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Farrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876060).. Attorney Gregory Farrell added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (nmb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10880317).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/21. (bnw)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil Oxford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876061).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Farrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876060).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Vilia B. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10876056).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10873841).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/1/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 1, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10868283). Attorney Jon M. Greenbaum added appearing on behalf of Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe (cdg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to David J. Worley. (ddm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (ddm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe for Matthew Mashburn (corrected) (Sells, Bryan)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe for defendant Matthew Mashburn (Sells, Bryan)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10868283).by Common Cause, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc., Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-1259-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/31/2021. (ddm)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rebecca N. Sullivan, #2 Summons David J. Worley, #3 Summons Anh Le)(rvb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. (rvb)
March 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, filed by Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10859449) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lower Muskogee Creek Tribe
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Common Cause
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Vilia Hayes
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Gregory Farrell
Represented By: Neil J. Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Congressional Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?