D Cut Products, Inc. v. William M. Bird and Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: D Cut Products, Inc.
Defendant: William M. Bird and Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01271
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, William M. Bird and Co., Inc. Answer due 6/2/2021. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/18/2021. (tmf)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by William M. Bird and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Bryan)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, William M. Bird and Co., Inc. Answer due 5/19/2021. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/3/2021. (tmf)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by William M. Bird and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Bryan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, William M. Bird and Co., Inc.'s Answer due 5/5/2021. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 04/20/2021. (jkb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by William M. Bird and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Bryan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Guy Harrison on behalf of William M. Bird and Co., Inc. (Harrison, Bryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by D Cut Products, Inc.. William M. Bird and Co., Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Borland, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission of Charles Cobey Kinne Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/1/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission of Kevin D. Erickson Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/1/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
April 1, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles Cobey Kinne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10865500). Attorney Charles Cobey Kinne added appearing on behalf of D Cut Products, Inc. (cdg)
April 1, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin D. Erickson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10865569). Attorney Kevin D. Erickson added appearing on behalf of D Cut Products, Inc. (cdg)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin D. Erickson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10865569).by D Cut Products, Inc.. (Borland, Elizabeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles Cobey Kinne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10865500).by D Cut Products, Inc.. (Borland, Elizabeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/2021. (tcc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 30, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by D Cut Products, Inc.. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to William M. Bird and Co., Inc.. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by D Cut Products, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10861297) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D Cut Products, Inc. v. William M. Bird and Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Bird and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Guy Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D Cut Products, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Borland
Represented By: Kevin D. Erickson
Represented By: Charles Cobey Kinne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?