Blackstone Residential Operating Partnership, LP v. Alani Property Source Co. et al
Plaintiff: Blackstone Residential Operating Partnership, LP
Defendant: Alani Property Source Co. and Aljermiah McKelthan
Case Number: 1:2021cv01356
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (accepted) re #7 Order. (jpk)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (submitted) re #7 Order. (jpk)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/3/2021. (jpk)
May 3, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
May 3, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alani Property Source Co. and Aljermiah McKelthan re #7 Order. (jpk)
April 27, 2021 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
April 13, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Aljermian McKalthan and Alani Property Source Co. as to Alani Property Source Co., Aljermiah McKelthan regarding #6 Order. (mlb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 04/09/2021. (rvb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 04/09/2021. (rvb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Aljermiah McKelthan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 9, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alani Property Source Co., Aljermiah McKelthan re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rvb)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER (contained within #4 Final R&R) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for purposes of jurisdictional review only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 04/09/2021. (rvb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Aljermiah McKelthan. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
April 5, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
April 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aljermiah McKelthan and Alani Property Source Co. re #2 Order. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackstone Residential Operating Partnership, LP v. Alani Property Source Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackstone Residential Operating Partnership, LP
Represented By: Christopher Brent Wardrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alani Property Source Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aljermiah McKelthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?