Bichler v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Bichler
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01404
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO.27 Amended Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Trial Pool Cases: The trial of Danielle Guffey v. Ethicon, Inc., et al., Member Case No. 1:18-CV-0402-RWS, scheduled to commence June 7, 2021, is continued until further order of the Court. In addition, all deadlines in Trial Pool Cases are suspended until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/18/2021. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. - Spread to 2019 thru 2021 cases. (rjc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis B. Swearingen on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Swearingen, Travis)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. (bdb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Richard Bichler. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10888075) DIRECT FILE MDL - Western Washington, Tacoma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bichler v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B. Swearingen
Represented By: G. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Travis B. Swearingen
Represented By: G. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bichler
Represented By: Adam W. Krause
Represented By: Robert L. Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?