Project Veritas v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Project Veritas
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01722
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Submission of #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
July 29, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Continue Case Planning Deadlines. The deadlines stated in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, and Local Rules 16 and 26, NDGa, shall commence upon, and shall be calculated from, the entry of an order resolving the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/22/2021. (rsg)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Planning Deadlines by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, Brian)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/12/2021 - 7/30/2021, by Douglas A. S. Chalmers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US v. Beck_Order_20210623)(Chalmers, Douglas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Project Veritas. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
June 18, 2021 Remark re #21 Notice of Filing: 1 CD received and placed in case file. (rjc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Filing Manually Filed Exhibit by Cable News Network, Inc. re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Scan of Manually Filed CD)(Schroeder, Eric)
June 15, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Decl. of Eric Schroeder + Exhibits)(Schroeder, Eric)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Corporate Parent Historic TW Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Media, LLC for Cable News Network, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the parties' #17 Second Joint Motion for Extensions and Revised Related Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. CNN's Rule 12 Response to Project Veritas's Complaint is due by June 15, 2021. Project Veritas's Response to CNN's Rule 12 Motion is due by July 8, 2021. CNN's Reply in Support of Rule 12 Motion is due by July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/10/2021. (ddm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 Court's Notice of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Harmeet K. Dhillon on behalf of Project Veritas (Dhillon, Harmeet)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald David Coleman on behalf of Project Veritas (Coleman, Ronald)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extensions and Related Briefing Schedule. Cable News Network, Inc. Answer due 6/10/2021. (see Order for more) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/17/2021. (rjc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint & Establish Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss re: #1 Complaint, by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, Brian) Modified on 5/14/2021 (rjc).
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc. (Underwood, Brian)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schroeder on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc. (Schroeder, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-1722-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/7/21. (rlb)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 , #7 , and #8 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/6/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
May 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Karin M. Sweigart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945278). Attorney Karin M. Sweigart added appearing on behalf of Project Veritas (cdg)
May 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Harmeet Kaur Dhillon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945269). Attorney Harmeet K. Dhillon added appearing on behalf of Project Veritas (cdg)
May 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald David Coleman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945262). Attorney Ronald David Coleman added appearing on behalf of Project Veritas (cdg)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Karin M. Sweigart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945278).by Project Veritas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Harmeet Kaur Dhillon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945269).by Project Veritas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald David Coleman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10945262).by Project Veritas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Cable News Network, Inc.. (Chalmers, Douglas)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/21. (eop)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.. (eop)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Project Veritas. (eop) Modified on 4/27/2021 to correct date filed (eop).
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Project Veritas. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10928963) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/27/2021 to correct date filed (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Veritas v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Veritas
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Douglas A. S. Chalmers, Jr.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Wagner
Represented By: Karin M. Sweigart
Represented By: Ronald David Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Represented By: Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?