EP&S, LLC et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dong Hyun Son and EP&S, LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Co. doing business as Pit Stop Convenience Store
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01738
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son. United States of America served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Tapp, Andrew)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Services (jpk)
April 29, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Z. Tapp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10935736). Attorney Andrew Zachary Tapp added appearing on behalf of EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son (cdg)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Z. Tapp. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son (Kish, Paul)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son (Kish, Paul)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son (Kish, Paul)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Z. Tapp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10935736).by EP&S, LLC, Dong Hyun Son. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Courts Admitted to Practice)(Kish, Paul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/21. (eop)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by EP&S, LLC and Dong Hyun Son. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10932024) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Final Agency Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EP&S, LLC et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Hyun Son
Represented By: Paul Stephen Kish
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EP&S, LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Co. doing business as Pit Stop Convenience Store
Represented By: Paul Stephen Kish
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?