Mendoza v. Salado
Petitioner: Ernesto Adan Mendoza
Respondent: Guidelia Agaton Salado
Case Number: 1:2021cv01795
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Court's Notice of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue. The hearing scheduled for May 11, 2021 is continued. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/11/2021. (rjc)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Order for Continuance re: #11 MOTION to Continue . (Lovett, Mitchell)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue by Ernesto Adan Mendoza. (Lovett, Mitchell)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligance by Ernesto Adan Mendoza. (Shewmaker, Patricia)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Guidelia Agaton Salado. (rjc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ernesto Adan Mendoza (Lovett, Mitchell)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff EXHIBITS admitted and retained at the #5 Evidentiary Hearing have been received electronically from Courtroom Deputy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(rjc)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for TRO. Neither Respondent nor any person acting in concert or participating with her shall take any action to remove the child, H.M.A., from the jurisdiction of this Court. A preliminary injunction hearing on the merits of the Verified Petition for Return of Child shall be held on May 11, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 1907, United States Courthouse, Northern District of Georgia, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Respondent is ORDERED to show cause why the child, H.M.A, should not be returned to the custody of the Petitioner and why such other relief as is requested in the Verified Petition for Return Of Child should not be granted at a hearing on May 11, 2021. Respondent is ORDERED to bring her passport to the May 11, 2021 hearing, as well as H.M.A.s passport, if one exists. This TRO shall expire upon conclusion of the May 11, 2021 hearing, unless prior to that time, (1) the Order is extended, upon good cause shown, for a further ten days; (2) the Parties consent to a longer period; or (3) the hearing is continued upon good cause shown and this Order is extended until the time of such hearing. This TRO shall be binding upon the Parties to this action, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and upon those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/3/2021. (rjc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for TRO, ex parte. Court heard argument from Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff's exhibits 1 (English translation of custody order) and 2 (English translation of custody order modification) admitted. Written order granting TRO to follow. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for May 11, at 2:00 PM. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerk's Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(rjc)
May 2, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order Under the Hague Convention re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED. (Lovett, Mitchell)
May 2, 2021 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDby Ernesto Adan Mendoza. (Lovett, Mitchell)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (rjc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION FOR RETURN OF A CHILD with Request for TRO (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10939987) filed by Ernesto Adan Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, #2 Exhibit Intenational Child Abduction Remedies Act, #3 Exhibit Child Custody Consent Order (English), #4 Exhibit Child Custody Consent Order (Spanish), #5 Exhibit Request for Aide and Return of the Child (English), #6 Exhibit Request for Aide and Return of Child (Spanish), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 30, 2021 Submission of #1 VERIFIED PETITION FOR RETURN OF A CHILD with Request for TRO to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjc)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 5/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones on Plaintiff's request for TRO as contained within the Complaint #1 . (pdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernesto Adan Mendoza
Represented By: Mitchell Edward Lovett
Represented By: Patricia D. Shewmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guidelia Agaton Salado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?