JBS Hair, Inc. v. Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: JBS Hair, Inc.
Defendant: Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01857
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.. (Nixon, Coby)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd. Answer due 7/12/2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/3/21. (jta)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nixon, Coby)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by JBS Hair, Inc.. Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd. served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (Kent, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JBS Hair, Inc.(rvb) Modified on 5/5/2021 to correct file date (rvb).
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd. (rvb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rvb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JBS Hair, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10952040) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US Pat No 10,786,026, #2 Exhibit B US Pat No 10,945,478, #3 Exhibit C US Pat No 10,980,301, #4 Exhibit D '026 Patent Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E '478 Patent Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F '301 Patent Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBS Hair, Inc. v. Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBS Hair, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Represented By: Olivia E. Marbutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Coby Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?