Coalition for Good Governance et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: Georgia Advancing Progress Political Action Committee, Ryan Graham, Patricia Pullar, Bradley Friedman, Antwan Lang, Ernestine Thomas-Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Rhonda Martin, Aileen Nakamura, Judy McNichols, Coalition for Good Governance, Adam Shirley, Jackson County Democratic Committee and Elizabeth Throop
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger, Anh Le, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Matthew Mashburn, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc., Sara Ghazal and Brian Kemp
Amicus Curiae: Georgia First Amendment Foundation
Case Number: 1:2021cv02070
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #30 Notice (Other) State Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan)
July 13, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Riddhi Dasgupta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11086072).. Attorney Riddhi Dasgupta added appearing on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (nmb)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/13/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 #26 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/9/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
July 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11073688).. Attorney Gene C. Schaerr added appearing on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (nmb)
July 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11073725).. Attorney H. Christopher Bartolomucci added appearing on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (nmb)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to the July 13, 2021 elections. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/7/2021. (adg)
July 6, 2021 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Riddhi Dasgupta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11086072).by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 2, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Post Hearing Brief by Coalition for Good Governance. (Brown, Bruce)
July 2, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
July 1, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2021 re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, which was TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court held Oral Argument on 7/1/21. See transcript for more details. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(cmd)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Georgia First Amendment Foundation's #29 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/1/21. (bnw)
June 30, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
June 30, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by Coalition for Good Governance Request for Judicial Notice (Hecht, Gregory)
June 30, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Georgia First Amendment Foundation with Brief In Support by Georgia First Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae)(Clyde, Thomas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Persons by Coalition for Good Governance. (Brown, Bruce)
June 30, 2021 Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' #24 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief is GRANTED. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/30/21. (bnw)
June 30, 2021 Submission of #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (rjc)
June 29, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief filed by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11073725).by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 29, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11073688).by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants may file a response, if any, to Plaintiffs' #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by 4:00 PM today (6/29/2021). Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/29/21. (bnw)
June 28, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Coalition for Good Governance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce)
June 28, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Coalition for Good Governance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Adams Declaration, #2 Affidavit Dufort Declaration, #3 Affidavit Kurish Declaration, #4 Affidavit Smith Declaration, #5 Affidavit Whitley Declaration, #6 Affidavit Marks Declaration, #7 Affidavit Warren Declaration, #8 Affidavit Martin Declaration)(Brown, Bruce)
June 24, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Norris Declaration)(Norris, Cameron)
June 24, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SB 202 As Passed, #2 Exhibit B - Dec. of Blake Evans)(Tyson, Bryan)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Georgia Republican Party, Inc.'s (Proposed Intervenors) #7 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Plaintiffs did not oppose the motion. In any event, the Court finds that permissive intervention is appropriate because plaintiffs do not contest that Proposed Intervenors' defenses share a common question of law or fact with the current action, and allowing Proposed Intervenors to join the action at this early stage of the litigation will not cause undue delay or burden. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Proposed Intervenors as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/21/21. (bnw)
June 18, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Paradise, Loree Anne)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Jacoutot, Bryan)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Sara Ghazal, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Tyson, Bryan)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Oral Argument set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619155622 Passcode: 322589 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (bnw)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court will consider Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on an expedited basis as follows: Defendants' response brief is due by 5:00 PM on June 24; Plaintiffs' reply brief is due by 5:00 PM on June 28; oral argument is scheduled for July 1 at 10:00 AM with each side allotted up to one hour to present its case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/15/21. (bnw)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Coalition for Good Governance. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Historic Photos, #3 Exhibit B - Marks Declaration, #4 Exhibit C- Dufort Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Friedman Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - Graham Declaration, #7 Exhibit F - Gray Declaration, #8 Exhibit G - Martin Declaration, #9 Exhibit H - Nakamura Declaration, #10 Exhibit I - Smith Declaration, #11 Exhibit J - Throop Declaration, #12 Exhibit K - Kurish Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, #14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Expedited Consideration)(Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Coalition for Good Governance.(Brown, Bruce) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. Sara Ghazal waiver mailed on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. Rebecca N. Sullivan waiver mailed on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. Matthew Mashburn waiver mailed on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. (Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for Good Governance. Anh Le waiver mailed on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Coalition for Good Governance. Brad Raffensperger served on 5/26/2021. (Brown, Bruce)
June 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C. Bagakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017499).. Attorney Steven Christopher Begakis added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
June 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017615).. Attorney Cameron T. Norris added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
June 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017589).. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER approving #3 #4 #5 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/7/21. (bnw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, and Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo In Support Of Motion)(Carver, William) Modified on 6/4/2021 to correct filer information (rjc).
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, and Georgia Republican Party, Inc. Discovery ends on 11/1/2021.(Carver, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/4/2021 to correct filer information (rjc).
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017615).by Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017589).by Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven C. Bagakis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017499).by Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/19/21. (bnw)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Adam Shirley, Antwan Lang, Bradley Friedman, Patricia Pullar, Ryan Graham, Ernestine Thomas-Clark, Coalition for Good Governance, Jackson County Democratic Committee, Aileen Nakamura, Rhonda Martin, Georgia Advancing Progress Political Action Committee, Jeanne Dufort, Elizabeth Throop and Judy McNichols. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10978394) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for Good Governance et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Advancing Progress Political Action Committee
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Graham
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Pullar
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Friedman
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Lang
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Thomas-Clark
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Dufort
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Martin
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Nakamura
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy McNichols
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for Good Governance
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Shirley
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County Democratic Committee
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Throop
Represented By: Gregory Keith Hecht
Represented By: Cary Ichter
Represented By: Shea E. Roberts
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Republican Congressional Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Ghazal
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Riddhi Dasgupta
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Georgia First Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Thomas MacIver Clyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?