Campbell v. Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Campbell
Defendant: Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02419
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures by Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc..(Bowen, Alexandra)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 First Initial Disclosures by Elizabeth Campbell.(Martoccio, Gary)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 12/6/2021. Motions due by 1/5/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this action to the undersigned by January 14, 2022, if the parties have not filed a motion for summary judgment or proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/9/2021. (rjc)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Elizabeth Campbell. (Martoccio, Gary)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Elizabeth Campbell. (rjc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.. (Bowen, Alexandra)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 CORRECTLY FILED AT DOC. #13 NOTICE by Elizabeth Campbell re #8 Order-Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Plaintiff's Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Martoccio, Gary) Modified on 8/9/2021 (rjc).
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Elizabeth Campbell.(Martoccio, Gary)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Elizabeth Campbell. (Martoccio, Gary)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 7/9/2021. (rjc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Answer to Complaint by Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc..(Bowen, Alexandra)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.. (Bowen, Alexandra)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/6/2021.(Bowen, Alexandra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Elizabeth Campbell. Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Martoccio, Gary)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.. (eop)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Elizabeth Campbell. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11038947) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marietta Drapery & Window Coverings Co., Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Campbell
Represented By: Gary Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?