Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc.
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: Nicholas P Hahalis and Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. doing business as Los Recuerdos Tavern
Case Number: 1:2021cv02545
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 30, 2021 Clerks Entry of Default as to Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. (ah)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc.)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Nicholas P Hahalis. Discovery ends on 12/13/2021.(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Nicholas P Hahalis served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 24, 2021 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (ceo)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hahalis)(ceo)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11059815) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas P Hahalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Recuerdos Tavern Inc. doing business as Los Recuerdos Tavern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Richard S. Bruno
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?