Bethel v. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ann Bethel
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC., The Cooper Companies Inc and Cooper Surgical Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02646
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Status Conference held on 8/23/2021. The Court held its monthly status conference. The parties are directed to file a proposed scheduling order for the September 21st status conference and motion hearing two weeks prior to the hearing. See transcript for details. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(tcc)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Order Regarding Docket Logistics of Filing of Short Form Complaints, Executed Waivers of Service of Summons of Process, and Notices of Appearance in Individual Cases. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/21/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(rjc)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021.(tmf)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00569. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2974, In re: Teva Pharmaceutical, USA, et., al. Information electronically sent to MDL Panel on 6/10/21, including cover letter, copy of amended complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (SJW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Ann Bethel.(Shakib, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Kerrianne L. Waters of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0569-MMH-PDB. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18313118) filed by Ann Bethel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shakib, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethel v. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bethel
Represented By: Christopher Shakib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Surgical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?