Skipper v. MEB Loan Trust IV et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Skipper
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Bank of America, U.S. Bank National Association, MEB Loan Trust IV and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02668
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Submission of #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ceo)
August 23, 2021 Submission of #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Revised) to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ceo)
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Refer Case to Dekalb Superior Court filed by Bank of America. (Rhadans, Allison)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America. (Rhadans, Allison) Modified to edit event text on 8/12/2021 (ceo).
August 6, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Refer Case to Dekalb Superior Court by Raymond Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Response to Removal, #2 Exhibit Mail Receipt)(ceo)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raymond Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Response to Removal, #2 Exhibit Mail Receipt)(ceo)
August 3, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER Order on Motion to Consolidate. (Cantrell, Kenneth)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC Defendants' Consent to Removal (Revised) (Cantrell, Kenneth)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Revised) by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Cantrell, Kenneth) Modified to edit text on 8/4/2021 (ceo).
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC Defendants' Consent to Removal (Revised) (Cantrell, Kenneth)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER Order on Motion to Consolidate. (Cantrell, Kenneth)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Cantrell, Kenneth)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants #7 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. The Court STAYS the discovery period and the parties obligations to comply with the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) conference, serving initial disclosures, and filing a joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Should the Court later deny Defendants Motion to Dismiss, the parties may commence discovery and shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference, serve initial disclosures, and file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan within thirty (30) days of the Court's Order denying such motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/30/21. (ceo)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is ORDERED that BANAs #3 Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery is GRANTED, staying the commencement of the discovery period and the parties obligations to comply with the deadlines for conducting the Rule 26(f) conference, filing initial disclosures, and filing a preliminary report and discovery plan. It is furthermore ORDERED that should the Court later deny BANAs Motion to Dismiss, the parties shall comply with all preliminary mandates of the federal and local rules within thirty (30) days of the Courts Order denying said motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/30/21.(ceo)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: For good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants #4 Motion to Exceed the Page Limitation is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/30/21. (ceo)
July 30, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raymond Skipper re #11 Order on Motion to Stay, #10 Order on Motion to Stay, #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ceo)
July 28, 2021 Submission of the #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, #3 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery, #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , and #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (aaq)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Tate, William)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A)(Tate, William)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum)(Tate, William)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Rhadans, Allison)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery with Brief In Support by Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America. (Rhadans, Allison)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Bank of America and McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11082807) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skipper v. MEB Loan Trust IV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Represented By: William Oxford Tate
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Wright
Represented By: Kenneth Ray Cantrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Allison Giardina Rhadans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEB Loan Trust IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: William Oxford Tate
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?