Rios v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Blanca Martinez Rios
Defendant: Kirt Thompson
Case Number: 1:2021cv02678
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Court's Notice Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jyoti Jindal. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/21/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm)
July 21, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jyoti Jindal re #7 Order. (ddm)
July 20, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jyoti Jindal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11103049).. Attorney Jyoti Jindal added appearing on behalf of Blanca Martinez Rios (nmb)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Blanca Martinez Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS proof of delivery)(Miller, Willis)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Blanca Martinez Rios. Kirt Thompson served on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS proof of delivery)(Miller, Willis)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Blanca Martinez Rios. Kirt Thompson served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS proof of delivery)(Miller, Willis)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jyoti Jindal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11103049).by Blanca Martinez Rios. (Miller, Willis) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the General Counsel, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Atty for NDGA, #2 Summons Office of Gen.Counsel)(ceo)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Blanca Martinez Rios (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11084662) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Martinez Rios
Represented By: Willis Linton Miller, IV
Represented By: Jyoti Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirt Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?