Chapman et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ronald D. Chapman and Vickie L. Chapman
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv02683
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brewster S. Rawls. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 6, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 6, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
August 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Glen H. Sturtevant added appearing on behalf of Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman (nmb)
August 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Brewster S. Rawls added appearing on behalf of Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman (nmb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Brewster S. Rawls (Rawls, Brewster)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Glen H. Sturtevant (Sturtevant, Glen)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice.by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice.by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Dale C. Ray, Jr. (Ray, Dale)
July 28, 2021 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
July 28, 2021 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. United States of America served on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Ray, Dale)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. United States of America served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Ray, Dale)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 07/23/2021. (jkb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice.by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice.by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 20, 2021 RETURN of #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11101793). to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
July 20, 2021 RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11101823). to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brewster S. Rawls Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11101823).by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11101793).by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman. (Ray, Dale) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Atty)(ceo)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ronald D. Chapman, Vickie L. Chapman (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11086196) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D. Chapman
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Dale C. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Glen H. Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie L. Chapman
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Dale C. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Glen H. Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?