Mitchom v. Holloway et al
Plaintiff: Regis Vaughn Mitchom
Defendant: Rodrdeous Holloway, Icon Acquisitions, LLC, The JLM Group, LLC doing business as Re/Max Premier and Torrence Ford
Case Number: 1:2021cv02727
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Cancel Lis Pendens with Brief In Support by Torrence Ford, Rodrdeous Holloway, Rodrdeous Holloway, Icon Acquisitions, LLC, Icon Acquisitions, LLC, The JLM Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Cancel Lis Pendens)(Garside, Leonard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim by Regis Vaughn Mitchom.(Thorpe, Charlena) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/31/2021 to remove all caps (rvb).
August 23, 2021 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Torrence Ford, The JLM Group, LLC. (Goldberg, Brian)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Torrence Ford, The JLM Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email correspondence with attachments)(Goldberg, Brian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Regis Vaughn Mitchom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thorpe, Charlena)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Torrence Ford, The JLM Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cashbaugh, Travis)
August 10, 2021 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Rodrdeous Holloway, Icon Acquisitions, LLC. (Garside, Leonard)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants Rodrdeous Holloway and Icon Acquisition, LLC's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT ( Discovery ends on 1/3/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against Regis Vaughn Mitchom by Icon Acquisitions, LLC, Rodrdeous Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Garside, Leonard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rodrdeous Holloway. (ah)
July 9, 2021 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Regis Vaughn Mitchom For RODRDEOUS HOLLOWAY (Thorpe, Charlena)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Torrence Ford, Icon Acquisitions, LLC, The JLM Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons JLM, #2 Summons Icon)(ah)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ah)
July 8, 2021 Submission of #1 Complaint, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regis Vaughn Mitchom. (ah)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction with Jury Demand filed by Regis Vaughn Mitchom (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11090252). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (part 1), #3 Exhibit 2 (part 2), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchom v. Holloway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regis Vaughn Mitchom
Represented By: Charlena L. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrdeous Holloway
Represented By: Leonard M. Garside, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Leonard M. Garside, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The JLM Group, LLC doing business as Re/Max Premier
Represented By: Brian S. Goldberg
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrence Ford
Represented By: Brian S. Goldberg
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?