Doe v. Emory University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Emory University
Case Number: 1:2021cv02763
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion to File and Proceed Under a Pseudonym. The parties are DIRECTED to use the names "John Doe" and "Jane Roe" in any public filing that refers to the two students whose conduct Is the subject of this litigation; moreover, to the extent any document is submitted in conjunction with any motion, brief, or pleading filed publicly in this case, which document would reveal the identity of either John Doe or Jane Roe, the parties are DIRECTED to redact the actual identities of these two individuals in any such public filing in this matter. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/17/2021. (dob)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Hamrick on behalf of Emory University (Hamrick, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Christine Eckel on behalf of Emory University (Eckel, Megan)
August 6, 2021 Submission of #3 MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Motion to File and Proceed Under a Pseudonym, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (dob)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Emory University Answer due 9/10/2021. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/5/2021. (dob)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Emory University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Bosin, Joshua)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Reid Jensen. (Coffman, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart Bernstein; granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas E. Lewis; and granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew T. Miltenberg by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on July 20, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
July 20, 2021 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 7/16/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
July 19, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew T. Miltenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098482).. Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg added appearing on behalf of John Doe (nmb)
July 19, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas E. Lewis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098455).. Attorney Nicholas E. Lewis added appearing on behalf of John Doe (nmb)
July 19, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098404).. Attorney Stuart Bernstein added appearing on behalf of John Doe (nmb)
July 13, 2021 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/13/2021. (dob)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11098322. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Application for Refund of Fees)(Coffman, Andrew)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew T. Miltenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098482).by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Coffman, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas E. Lewis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098455).by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Coffman, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11098404).by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Coffman, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to File and Proceed Under a Pseudonym by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Coffman, Andrew) Modified on 7/13/2021 to edit text to reflect PDF (dob).
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Emory University. (ceo)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Doe. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11095593) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Emory University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andrew Yancey Coffman
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Nicholas E. Lewis
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory University
Represented By: Megan Christine Eckel
Represented By: John Michael Hamrick
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Bosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?